+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 643-Keaveny, with SCS, SS for SCS, SA 1 & SA 1 to SA 1 (pending)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Lembke)--(3356S11.05S)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Lembke)--(3356S11.03S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Keaveny)--(3356S.11F)
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 30, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee (3356S.08C)
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 643-Keaveny
On December 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor