+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 639-Schmitt, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(3471S.04F)
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3471S.03C)
On April 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 639-Schmitt
On December 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor