+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Regulatory Oversight and Reform
- H Second Read
On April 27, 2020 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 632-Hegeman
On December 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4127S.02F
SS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor