+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On July 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed
- CCR H adopted (5053S05.01F)
On May 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- CCR S offered & adopted (5053S05.1SR)
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- H submits CCR
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Rieboldt, Guernsey, Loehner, Schieffer, Taylor
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Parson, Munzlinger, Stouffer, Callahan, Justus
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & defeated (Nance)--(5053H04.13H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reiboldt)--(5053H04.11H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Guernsey)--(5053H04.14H)
- HA 2 to HCS H adopted
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(5053H04.08H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(5053H04.07H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelley-126)--(5053H04.17H)
- HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Loehner)--(4043H04.21H)
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & defeated (McCreery)--(5053H04.12H)
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- HA 8 to HCS H offered (Smith-150)--(5053H04.18H)
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
- S requests H recede or grant conference
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & defeated (Holsman)--(5053H04.01L)
- HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Harris)--(5053H04.23H)
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Agriculture Policy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Agriculture Policy Committee
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Agriculture Policy Committee
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (5053S.02C)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee
On January 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 631-Parson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor