+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 61-Hegeman, with SCS
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (0415S.02C)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 61-Hegeman
On December 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor