+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 607, 602, 615 & 725-Stouffer, with SCS & SA 1 (pending)
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Stouffer)--(3411S03.06S)
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 607, 602, 615 & 725) S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee (3411S.03C)
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 607-Stouffer
On December 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor