+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 591-Parson, with HCS, as amended
On May 8, 2012 in the House:
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Barnes)--(4702L05.35H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered (Jones-117)--(4702L05.08H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(4702L05.12H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Flanigan)--(4702L05.32H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Silvey)--(4702L05.29H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franz)--(4702L05.28H)
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended - EC adopted
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- HCS Reconsidered H General Laws Committee
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Ridgeway)--(4702S02.10S)
- SA 1 to SCS S withdrawn
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SCS S offered (Dempsey)--(4702S02.02S)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
- Reported from S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On January 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee - Consent - (4702S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On January 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 591-Parson
On December 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor