+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (72)
On May 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
- Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
- Motion to adopt CCR
- Motion to adopt CCR withdrawn
- CCR S offered
- Motion to adopt CCR
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
On May 11, 2006 in the House:
- HA 4 to HCS H adopted
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
On May 11, 2006 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Kingery, Bearden, Pearce, Zweifel, Bringer
On May 11, 2006 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Nodler, Shields, Mayer, Wilson, Days
- Conferee changes: Sen. Cauthorn replaces Sen. Shields
On May 10, 2006 in the House:
- HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cooper-158)--(3716L07.22H)
- HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Johnson-90)--(3716L07.04F)
- HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Storch)--(3716L07.05F)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Zweifel)--(3716L07.08H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered (Schneider)--(3716L07.02L)
- Laid over
- HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
On May 8, 2006 in the House:
- HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Bringer)--(4716L07.02F)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered (Kingery)--(3716L07.11H)
- HA 2 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Shoemyer)--(3716L07.03F)
- HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Hubbard)--(3716L07.15H)
On April 25, 2006 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education Committee
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education Committee
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Higher Education Committee
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Higher Education Committee
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- SA 8 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Mayer)--(3716S05.08S)
- SA 2 to SA 6 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
- SSA 1 for SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(3716S05.13S)
- SA 7 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Coleman)--(3716S05.06F)
- SA 2 to SA 9 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Shields)--(3716S05.07F)
- SA9 to SS for SCS S offered (Ridgeway)--(3716S05.12S)
- SA 1 to SA 9 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Champion)--(3716S05.16S)
- SA 9 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted--(3716S05.12S)
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted (3716S.05F)
- Perfected
On February 7, 2006 in the Senate:
- SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted(Dougherty)--(8059S06.01S)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S adopted (3716S05.01F)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(3716S05.07S)
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Gross)--(3716S05.02F)
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 5 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Nodler)--(3716S05.11S)
- SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered (Green)--(3716S02.01S)
- SA 1 to SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered & withdrawn (Scott)--(3716S05.03F)
- SA 2 to SA 6 to SS for SCS S offered (Scott)--(3716S05.04F)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Crowell)--(3716S05.01F)
- SS for SCS S offered (Nodler)--(3716S.05F)
On February 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS
On January 31, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3716S.02C)
On January 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Education Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor