+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed
- H adopts CCR
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
- CCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Senate conferees appointed: Hegeman, Koenig, Cunningham, Rizzo, Hummel
- House conferees appointed: Rehder, Engler, Taylor, Roberts, Washington
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- H distributes CCR (4244S17.01F)
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Referred H Fiscal Review
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- S refuses to concur in HA 1 and requests H recede or grant conference (Hegeman)
- Motion to refuse to concur in HA 1 and requests H recede or grant conference withdrawn
- Point of order withdrawn
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to refuse to concur in HA 1 and requests H recede or grant conference motion withdrawn (Hegeman)
- Motion to concur in HA 1 withdrawn (Hegeman)
- Point of order (Dixon) using Senate Rule 97 & US Senate Rule 19.2 - taken under advisement
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended
- HA 1 H offered & adopted (Rehder)--(4244S12.11H)
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard H General Laws
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
- Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S withdrawn
- SS#2 for SCS S offered (Hegeman)
- SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rizzo)
- SA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)
- SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)
- SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)
- SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Bill placed on Informal Calendar
- SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
- SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
- SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (4244S.07C)
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 590-Hegeman
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (24)
4244S.17S
CCS S Third Read and Passed
4244S17.1SR
CCR S offered & adopted (Hegeman)
4244S17.01F
Distributed
4244S12.26H
Distributed
4244S12.27H
Distributed
4244S12.15H
Distributed
4244S12.18H
Distributed
4244S12.21H
Distributed
4244S12.22H
Distributed
4244S12.24H
Distributed
4244S12.25H
Distributed
4244S12.14H
Distributed
4244S12.11H
Adopted
4244S12.12H
Distributed
4244S12.13H
Distributed
4244S12.02S
SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Wasson)
4244S12.12S
SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)
4244S.12F
SS#2 for SCS S offered (Hegeman)
4244S12.07S
SA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Sifton)
4244S12.01S
SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rizzo)
4244S08.02F
SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
4244S08.03S
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
4244S08.01F
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schaaf)
4244S.08F
SS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor