+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by Senate President
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2010 in the House:
- Part IV of HCS H adopted
- Part III of HCS H adopted
- HA 1 to Part II of HCS H offered & defeated (Dougherty)--(3570L06.01F)
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- S concurs in HCS
- S Third Read and Passed
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2010 in the House:
- Part II of HCS H adopted
On May 12, 2010 in the House:
- Laid over
- Part I of HCS H adopted
- HA 3 to Part I of HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Colona)--(3570L06.10H)
- HA 2 to Part I of HCS H defeated
- HSA 1 for HA 2 to Part I of HCS H offered & withdrawn (Englund)--(3570l06.23H)
- HA 2 to Part I of HCS H offered (Colona)--(3570L06.11H)
- HA 1 to Part I of HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Skaggs)--(3570L06.14H)
On May 6, 2010 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H defeated
- HA 1 to HCS H offered (Dougherty)--(3570L06.05H)
- Laid over
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Holsman)--(3570L06.02L)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Meiners)--(3570L06.06H)
- Laid over
On April 26, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Small Business Committee
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Small Business Committee
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Small Business Committee
On March 30, 2010 in the House:
- Referred H Small Business Committee
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS S adopted
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Justus)--(3570S03.13S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Bartle)--(3570S.03F)
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS/SBs 586 & 617) S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (3570S.02C)
On January 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 586-Bartle
On December 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor