+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SS, as amended, S adopted--(3388S.04F)
- SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(3388S04.01F)
- SS S offered (Champion)--(3388S.04F)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 18, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor