+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS H adopted
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 581-Libla
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4585H03.04H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor