+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SS for SCS for SB 58-Stouffer and Lembke, with HCS, as amended
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Zerr)--(0108L18.01L)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-63)--(0108L18.11H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Wells)--(0108L18.14H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Smith-150)--(0108L18.04H)
- HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(0108L18.16H)
- HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Denison)--(0108L18.01H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Schad)--(0108L18.03H)
- H Third Read and Passed
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Rowland)--(0108L18.12H)
- HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cierpiot)--(0108L18.15H)
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Long)--(0108L18.02H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Torpey)--(0108L18.01F)
- HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stream)--(0108L18.02L)
- HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Denison)--(0108L18.06H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation Committee
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(0108S.12F)
- Perfected
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee (0108S.09C)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Transportation Committee
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Transportation Committee
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 58-Stouffer and Lembke
On December 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor