+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- In Conference--SB 578-Parson, with HCS, as amended
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- H submits CCR
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Cox, Gatschenberger, Jones-117, Hummel, McManus
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Parson, Munzlinger, Engler, Wright-Jones, Chappelle-Nadal
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(4760L04.01L)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Richardson)--(4760L04.09H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(4760L04.13H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4760L04.02H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(4760L04.06H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(4760L04.15H)
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4760L04.12H)
- Laid over
- HA 8 to HCS H offered (Jones-89)--(4760L04.07H)
- HA 1 to HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(4760L04.17H)
- HA 8 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(4760L04.04H)
- HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hummel)--(4760L04.11H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government Committee
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee - Consent
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee
On January 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 578-Parson
On December 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor