+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- S Bills with H Amendments--SB 573-Schmitt, with HCS, as amended
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(4617H07.07H)
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Emerging Issues
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7)
- Voted Do Pass H Emerging Issues
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Emerging Issues
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Emerging Issues
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 573-Schmitt
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (8)
4617H07.08H
Distributed
4617H07.05H
Distributed
4617H07.04H
Distributed
4617H07.06H
Distributed
4617H07.07H
Adopted
4617H07.03H
Distributed
4617H07.02H
Distributed
4617H07.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor