+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (66)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- CCS#2 H Third Read and Passed
- CCR#2 H adopted
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- S grants further conference
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- H refuses to adopt CCR
- H requests further conference
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Dixon, Keaveny, Holsman
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR#2 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)
- CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- H distributes CCR#2
- H conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Curtman, Rizzo, Mitten
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- H distributes CCR
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
- CCR S offered & adopted (Schmitt)
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Schmitt, Schaefer, Dixon, Keaveny, Holsman
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- H conferees appointed: Cornejo, McGaugh, Curtman, Rizzo, Mitten
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered (McGaugh)--(4953H09.26H)
- HA 1 to HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(4953H09.35H)
- HA 1 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones)--(4953H09.28H)
- Laid over
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(4953H09.31H)
- HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davis)--(4953H09.36H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Roden)--(4953H09.02H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered (Brattin)--(4953H09.24H)
- HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzwater)--(4953H09.30H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over
- Taken up
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9)
- Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCA 2, 3, 4, HCA 1 to HCA 5, HCA 5, aa, HCA 6 & HCA 7
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- H Second Read
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- H First Read
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Holsman)
- SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4953S.05C)
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 572-Schmitt
On December 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (38)
4953S.14S
CCS#2 S Third Read and Passed
4953S14.1SR
CCR#2 S offered & adopted (Schmitt)
4953S14.01F
Distributed
4953S13.01F
Distributed
4953S.13S
CCS S Third Read and Passed
4953S13.1SR
CCR S offered & adopted (Schmitt)
4953H09.36H
Adopted
4953H09.35H
Adopted
4953S07.31H
Distributed
4953H09.34H
Distributed
4953H09.27H
Distributed
4953H09.28H
Adopted
4953H09.31H
Adopted
4953H09.30H
Adopted
4953H09.25H
Distributed
4953H09.26H
Adopted
4953H09.10H
Distributed
4953H09.23H
Distributed
4953H09.24H
Adopted
4953H09.22H
Distributed
4953H09.18H
Distributed
4953H09.17H
Distributed
4953H09.04H
Distributed
4953H09.02H
Defeated
4953H09.13H
Distributed
4953H09.12H
Distributed
4953H09.07H
Distributed
4953S07.28H
Distributed
4953S07.23H
Committee
4953S07.22H
Committee
4953S07.21H
Committee
4953S07.20H
Committee
4953S07.07H
Committee
4953S07.12H
Committee
4953S07.15H
Committee
4953S07.06S
SA 2 to SS for SCS offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)
4953S07.04S
SA 1 to SS for SCS offered (Holsman)
4953S.07F
SS for SCS offered (Schmitt)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor