+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Conference--SB 569-Cunningham, with HCS, as amended (Senate adopted CCR and passed CCS)
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed
- CCR S offered & adopted (Cunningham)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
- H distributes CCR (4967S05.01F)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Fraker, Redmon, Cornejo, Mitten, McCreery
- Senate conferees appointed: Cunningham, Wieland, Crawford, Walsh, Sifton
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(4967H02.01H)
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Institutions
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Perfected
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 569-Cunningham
On December 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
4967S.05S
CCS S Third Read and Passed
4967S05.1SR
CCR S offered & adopted (Cunningham)
4967S05.01F
Distributed
4967H02.01H
Adopted
4967H02.05H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor