+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (67)
On July 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by Senate President
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR H adopted
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR S adopted
On May 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to adopt CCR be postposed indefinitely
- Motion to adopt CCR
- CCR S offered (4756S11.1SR)
- Substitute motion that vote on CCR be postponed to a date certain
- Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn
- Motion to adopt CCR S withdrawn
On May 7, 2012 in the House:
- H submits CCR
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- H conferees appointed: Franz, Silvey, Brown (116), Webber, Meadows
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Parson, Stouffer, Richard, McKenna, Wright-Jones
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- S requests H recede or grant conference
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Franz)--(4756L05.08H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered (Franz)--(4756L05.01H)
- HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Nance)--(4756L05.06H)
- HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Swearingen)--(4756L05.10H)
- HA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 3 to HCS H offered (Smith-150)--(4756L05.05H)
- HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Long)--(4756L05.01F)
- HA 2 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Nance)--(4756L05.11H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered (Loehner)--(4756L05.09H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-116)--(4756L05.02H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Brown-116)--(4756L05.04H)
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- HA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(4756L05.16H)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered (Elmer)--(4756L05.15H)
- HA 4 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
- HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Wells)--(4756L05.21H)
On April 19, 2012 in the House:
- Laid over
- Taken up for Third Reading
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred H General Laws Committee
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S defeated
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - (4756S.02C)
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 568-Parson
On December 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor