+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(4341H06.02H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kelly-45)--(4341H06.06H)
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- S concurs in HCS, as amended
- S Third Read and Passed
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4341S03.01S)
- Perfected
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee (4341S.03C)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Pensions Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 567-Chappelle-Nadal
On December 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
4341S03.01S
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor