+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13)
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13)
- Reported Do Pass H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness w/HCAs 2 & 3
- Voted Do Pass H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness w/Amendments
- Hearing Conducted H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
- H Second Read
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor
- Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 561-Wasson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor