+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 559-Schatz, with SCS
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Professional Registration Committee w/SCS
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee (3329S.04C)
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 559-Schatz
On December 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor