+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Bill Combined w/(SCS/SBs 588, 557, 579, 563, 869, 619, 570, 753, 764, 782, 783 & 890)
On January 23, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor