+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 23, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President
On May 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government & Related Matters Committee - Consent
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government & Related Matters Committee - Consent
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government & Related Matters Committee
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
- Referred H Local Government & Related Matters Com.
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Gov. Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee-Consent
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee-Consent
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor