+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee - Consent
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Governmental Organization Vet. Affairs & Elections Comm. to Floor - Consent
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee-Consent
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org. Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee-Consent
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor