+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On April 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Pensions & General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Pensions & General Laws Committee (1281S.06C)
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Pensions & General Laws Committee
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Pensions & General Laws Committee
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor