+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On May 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Government Org., Vet. Affairs & Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee (1790S.02C)
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On February 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor