+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 249 & 523 S Ways & Means Committee
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Sub-Committee
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On February 21, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Scott
Type:
Primary Sponsor