+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- 006 S Calendar S Bills for Perfection w/SCS
On April 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass w/SCS SBs 508 & 468 S Ways & Means Committee (1953S.02C)
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor