+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
On April 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - Consent
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee - Consent
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee - Consent
On March 11, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Elections Committee
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 25, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Financial & Governmental Organization Veterans' Affairs & Elections to Floor-Consent
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organ., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee - Consent
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Org., Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On January 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organization, Veterans' Affairs & Elections Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor