+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 17, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Signed by Senate President
- Signed by House Speaker
- Delivered to Governor
On May 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
On May 7, 2001 in the House:
- HCS H defeated
- H Third Read and Passed
On May 2, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Committee
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Miscellaneous Bills & Resolutions Com.
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS S adopted
- Perfected
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass w/SCS SBs 5 & 21 S Ways & Means Committee
On January 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On January 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 3, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
On December 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor