+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Governor took no action, sent to Secretary of State/Article III, Sec. 31
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cox)--(4153H07.01H)
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- H Third Read and Passed
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- S concurs in HCS, as amended
- S Third Read and Passed
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Referred to H Rules Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Judiciary Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- S Third Read and Passed
- Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Perfected
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(4153S05.07S)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Justus)--(4153S05.08S)
- SS for SCS S offered (Justus and Dixon)--(4153S.05F)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken up for Perfection
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4153S.03C)
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing to be Continued S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 491-Justus and Dixon
On December 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (5)
4153S05.07S
Adopted
4153S05.08S
Adopted
4153S03.07S
Adopted
4153S03.08S
Adopted
4153S.05F
Adopted, as amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor