+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 12, 2017 in the House:
- H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy
- Voted Do Pass H Health and Mental Health Policy
- Hearing Conducted H Health and Mental Health Policy
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy
- H Second Read
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- SS S offered & adopted (Schupp)
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
- Perfected
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Professional Registration Committee
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Removed S Consent Calendar
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Professional Registration Committee - Consent
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Professional Registration Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 490-Schupp
+ − Amendments (9)
2176S02.12H
Distributed
2176S02.11H
Distributed
2176S02.10H
Distributed
2176S02.08H
Distributed
2176S02.07H
Distributed
2176S02.06H
Distributed
2176S02.05H
Distributed
2176S02.04H
Distributed
2176S.02F
SS S offered (Schupp)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor