+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
On April 24, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation & Motor Vehicle Committee
On April 9, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed, as amended
- SCA 1 S adopted
On April 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor w/SCA 1
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass w/SCA 1 S Government Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Government Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- SS for SS for SCS S withdrawn
- SS for SCS S withdrawn
- SS#2 for SCS S offered (Dolan) (1166S.20F)
- SA 3 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Scott)
- SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Bray)
- SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Bray)
- SA 7 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Gross)
- SA 4 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Cauthorn)
- SA 5 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Griesheimer)
- SA 6 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Caskey)
- SA 8 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & defeated (Bland)
- SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- SS for SS for SCS S offered (Russell) (1166S.13F)
- SS for SCS S offered (Dolan) (1166S.15F)
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor w/SCS
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation Comm. (1166S.11C)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor