+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (52)
On July 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
- Delivered to Governor
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 13, 2011 in the House:
- CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR H adopted
On May 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
- CCR S offered & adopted
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- HA 7 to HCS H offered & Ruled out of order (Solon)--(0251L04.12H)
- HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(0251L04.07H)
- HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Riddle)--(0251L04.09H)
- HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Smith-150)--(0251L04.01F)
- HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hinson)--(0251L04.11H)
- HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(0251L04.10H)
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- S conferees appointed: Wright-Jones, Green, Lager, Schaefer, Dixon
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- HCS, as amended, H adopted
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended
- S requests H recede or grant conference
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- H refuses to recede and grants conference
- H conferees appointed: Pollock, Smith-150, Schad, Hummel, Webb
- H submits CCR
- HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Pollock)--(0251L04.01L)
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee
- Hearing Scheduled H Utilities Committee--(12:00 pm - HR 1)
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Utilities Committee
On April 22, 2011 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS Ruled out of order
- SS for SCS S offered (Wright-Jones)--(0251S.03F)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Kraus)--(0251S03.08S)
- Perfected
- SCS Ruled out of order
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor w/SCS
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee - (0251S.02C)
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 48-Wright-Jones
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor