+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 465-Schaaf
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 465-Schaaf
On December 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor