+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- In Conference
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- H Conferees Appointed
On May 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Conferees Appointed
On May 15, 2001 in the House:
- H Refused to recede & granted conference
On May 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- HA 1 to Part 2 of HS for HCS H offered (Hegeman)
- HSA 1 for HA 1 to Part 2 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Kennedy)
- HA 2 to Part 2 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Hanaway)
- HA 3 to Part 2 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Shields)
- Part 2 of HS for HCS, as amended, H adopted
- Motion to Refer to Fiscal Review - Defeated
On May 14, 2001 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
On May 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Refused to concur in HS for HCS, as amended
- S Requested H recede or grant conference
On May 11, 2001 in the House:
- HS for HCS H offered (Kennedy) (1849L.07F)
- HA 1 to HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Kennedy)
On May 11, 2001 in the Senate:
- HS divided
- HA 1 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Surface)
- HA 2 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Barry)
- HA 3 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Surface)
- HA 4 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Skaggs)
- HA 5 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & adopted (Campbell)
- HA 6 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & defeated (Cooper)
- HA 7 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & defeated (Hegeman)
- HA 8 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & defeated (Byrd)
- HA 9 to Part 1 of HS for HCS H offered & defeated (Hunter)
- Part 1 of HS for HCS, as amended, H adopted
On April 26, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee
On April 12, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Ways & Means Committee
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways & Means Committee
On April 2, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
- Referred H Ways & Means Committee
On March 29, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 6, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee-Consent
On February 19, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor