+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Commerce, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Energy and the Environment Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor