+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 449-Rupp
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken up for Perfection
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee to Floor
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
On January 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Health, Mental Health, Seniors and Families Committee
On January 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 449-Rupp
On December 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor