+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed, as amended
- S concurs in HCA 1
On April 23, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed, as amended - Consent
- HCA 1 H adopted
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass w/HCA 1 H Judiciary Com.-Consent
On April 14, 2003 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass w/HCA 1 H Judiciary Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted H Judiciary Committee
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Judiciary Committee
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS, as amended, S adopted
- SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Bartle)
On March 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Judiciary & Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Removed from S Consent Calendar
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Judiciary & Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary & Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee-Consent (1456S.03C)
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary & Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary & Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor