+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Tourism & Cultural Affairs Committee
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Transportation Committee to Floor - Consent
On March 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee-Consent
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On February 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor