+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Retirement Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Retirement Committee
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Special Committee on Retirement
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee - Consent
- Hearing Conducted S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Pensions, Veterans' Affairs and General Laws Committee
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor