+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 399-Onder
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 399-Onder
+ − Sponsor
Onder
Type:
Primary Sponsor