+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
- Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Formal Calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Local Government
- Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Local Government
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Local Government
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred H Local Government
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted
- Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
- Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 397-White
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor