+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Transportation Committee
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Transportation Committee
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Transportation Committee to Floor - Consent
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Transportation Committee - Consent
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Transportation Committee
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Transportation Committee
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor