+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Perfected
- SCS S adopted
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Corrected Committee Report Submitted
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor w/SCS
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 394 & 331) S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee - (1860S.03C)
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- S First Read--SB 394-Goodman and Lamping
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor