+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 18, 2001 in the House:
- HCS H defeated
- HA 1 H offered & withdrawn (Rizzo)
- H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
On May 14, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Fiscal Review Committee
- Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
- Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Fiscal Review Committee
On May 8, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Commerce & Economic Development Committee
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Commerce & Economic Development Committee
On April 17, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Commerce Committee
On April 9, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Commerce Committee
On April 5, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 4, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On March 28, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Budget Control Committee
- Voted Do Pass S Budget Control Committee
- Reported From S Budget Control Committee to Floor
On March 27, 2001 in the Senate:
- SA 1 S offered & adopted (Gibbons)
- SA 2 S offered & adopted (Mathewson)
- Perfected, as amended
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
- Referred S Budget Control Committee
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 31, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor