+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by House Speaker
- Signed by Senate President
- Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed to and Finally Passed
- S Third Read and Passed
- S concurs in HCS
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- H Third Read and Passed
- HCS H adopted
On May 8, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Services Committee
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Services Committee
On April 15, 2003 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Financial Services Committee
On April 7, 2003 in the House:
- Referred H Financial Services Committee
- H Second Read
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee to Floor w/SCS-Consent
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance & Industrial Relations Committee-Consent (1261S.03C)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industrial Relations Committee
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor