+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 18, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Inf Calendar S Bills for Perfection
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On March 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Committee(1292S.03C)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Re-referred S Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Economic Development Committee
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor