+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Ways & Means Committee
On April 25, 2001 in the House:
- Referred H Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2001 in the House:
- H Second Read
On April 10, 2001 in the House:
- H First Read
On April 10, 2001 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed
On April 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee
On April 4, 2001 in the Senate:
- SS for SCS S offered (Gibbons) (1440S.04F)
- SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Jacob)
- SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Caskey)
- SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Westfall)
- SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
- Perfected
On March 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
On February 22, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported From S Ways & Means Committee to Floor w/SCS
On February 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means Comm. (1440S.03C)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Ways & Means Committee
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Ways & Means Committee
On January 29, 2001 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor