+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee
On April 30, 2007 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee
- Hearing Conducted H Rules Committee
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(26)(f)
- HCS Reported Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Hearing Conducted H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On April 12, 2007 in the House:
- Referred H Crime Prevention & Public Safety Committee
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- H Second Read
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- H First Read
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- S Third Read and Passed - Consent
- SCS S adopted
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS - Consent
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent (1175S.04C)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Hearing Conducted S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred S Financial & Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- S First Read
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor